MA H3460 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4715
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H4715
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H4715
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Representative Vargas of Haverhill, a petition of Andres X. Vargas and others that the Registrar of Motor Vehicles establish a distinctive registration placard to exempt Purple Heart recipients from payment of municipal parking meter fees. Transportation.
Title
Concerning an exemption from payment of municipal parking meter fees by Purple Heart recipients
Sponsors
Rep. Andres Vargas [D] | Rep. Alice Peisch [D] | Sen. Anne Gobi [D] | Rep. Colleen Garry [D] |
Rep. Sean Garballey [D] | Rep. Patrick Kearney [D] | Rep. Steven Xiarhos [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-06 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4715 |
2023-11-08 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/20/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
H4715 (Replaced by) 2024-06-06 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3460 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3460.pdf |