MA H3463 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4528
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to certain behavioral health coverage for persons under twenty-one years of age . Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities.
Title
Relative to the Children's Behavioral Health Initiative
Sponsors
Rep. Aaron Vega [D] | Rep. Brian Ashe [D] | Rep. Carlos Gonzalez [D] | Rep. Susannah Whipps Lee [I] |
Rep. Bud Williams [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-24 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4528 |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2018-04-24 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday May 16, 2018, pending concurrence |
2018-04-02 | House | Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2017-11-21 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/21/17 from 1:00PM-5:00PM in A-1 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities |
Same As/Similar To
H2468 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H2399 (Similar To) 2018-06-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H4557
H2223 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
H1190 (Similar To) 2018-06-27 - New draft substituted, see H4664
H1062 (Similar To) 2018-06-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4624
H601 (Similar To) 2018-06-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4605
H4528 (Replaced by) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H2399 (Similar To) 2018-06-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H4557
H2223 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
H1190 (Similar To) 2018-06-27 - New draft substituted, see H4664
H1062 (Similar To) 2018-06-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4624
H601 (Similar To) 2018-06-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4605
H4528 (Replaced by) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3463 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3463.pdf |