MA H348 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4600
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H4600
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H4600
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to municipal revenue growth factors for support of local schools and school districts. Education.
Title
Relative to establishing a limit for the municipal revenue growth factor
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-06 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4600 |
2015-09-28 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/06/2015 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
H4600 (Replaced by) 2016-09-06 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H180 (Similar To) 2016-08-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4578
H179 (Similar To) 2016-08-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4578
H2282 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4367
H2283 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4367
H2281 (Similar To) 2015-05-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 28 of the Acts of 2015
H180 (Similar To) 2016-08-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4578
H179 (Similar To) 2016-08-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4578
H2282 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4367
H2283 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4367
H2281 (Similar To) 2015-05-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 28 of the Acts of 2015
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H348 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H348.pdf |