MA H348 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4880
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4880
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4880
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish plumbing code regulations that provide building owners with guidelines for reusing greywater for toilet flushing and subsurface irrigation. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.
Title
Relative to greywater recycling
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-30 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4880 |
2021-07-27 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 08/02/2021 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
H2207 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S212 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2666
H382 (Similar To) 2022-06-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4880
H390 (Similar To) 2022-06-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4880
H439 (Similar To) 2022-06-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4880
H4880 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S212 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2666
H382 (Similar To) 2022-06-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4880
H390 (Similar To) 2022-06-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4880
H439 (Similar To) 2022-06-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4880
H4880 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H348 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H348.pdf |