MA H3487 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 93 of the Acts of 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 93 of the Acts of 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the board of selectmen of the town of Sherborn to enter into an employment contract for the position of police chief
Title
Authorizing the board of selectmen of the town of Sherborn to enter into an employment contract for the position of police chief
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-10 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 93 of the Acts of 2012 | |
2012-04-30 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2012-04-30 | House | Enacted |
2012-04-26 | Senate | Read, rules suspended, read second, ordered to a third reading, read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2012-03-05 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2011-12-19 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2011-12-19 | House | Rules suspended |
2011-12-19 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2011-12-01 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2011-10-14 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/18/2011 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2 |
2011-06-13 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2011-06-09 | House | Referred to the House committee on Public Service |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H3487 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=16793&generalCourtId=1 |