MA H3488 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on November 2 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-11-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 147 of the Acts of 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on November 2 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-11-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 147 of the Acts of 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Mr. Murphy of Burlington and Senator Donnelly, a joint petition of Charles A. Murphy (by vote of the town) exempting certain positions in the town of Burlington from the civil service law. Public Service. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
EXEMPTING CERTAIN POSITIONS IN THE TOWN OF BURLINGTON FROM THE CIVIL SERVICE LAW
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-11-02 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 147 of the Acts of 2011 | |
2011-10-27 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2011-10-26 | House | Enacted |
2011-10-24 | Senate | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2011-10-24 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2011-09-22 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2011-09-01 | Senate | Read and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2011-08-29 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2011-08-18 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2011-08-18 | House | Rules suspended |
2011-08-18 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2011-08-08 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2011-07-08 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/19/2011 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1 |
2011-06-13 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2011-06-09 | House | Referred to the House committee on Public Service |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H3488 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=16844&generalCourtId=1 |