MA H3509 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4557
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H4557
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H4557
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a voucher assistance program for certain drug dependent persons released from incarceration and assigned to certified alcohol and drug free housing . Mental Health, Substance Use and Recovery.
Title
Relative to post-release placement for certain inmates
Sponsors
Sen. Diana DiZoglio [D] | Sen. James Eldridge [D] | Rep. Thomas Golden [D] | Rep. Juana Matias [D] |
Sen. Richard Ross [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-04 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4557 |
2017-06-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/13/2017 from 10:00 AM-12:00 PM in A-2 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Mental Health, Substance Use and Recovery |
Same As/Similar To
H805 (Similar To) 2017-10-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2170
S1335 (Similar To) 2018-01-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H794 (Similar To) 2017-10-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2170
S1336 (Similar To) 2018-01-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1278 (Similar To) 2017-10-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2587 (Similar To) 2017-09-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3914
H925 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H825 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H822 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H3498 (Similar To) 2018-04-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4357
S713 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2487
H514 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
H4557 (Replaced by) 2018-06-04 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S1335 (Similar To) 2018-01-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H794 (Similar To) 2017-10-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2170
S1336 (Similar To) 2018-01-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1278 (Similar To) 2017-10-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2587 (Similar To) 2017-09-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3914
H925 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H825 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H822 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H3498 (Similar To) 2018-04-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4357
S713 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2487
H514 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
H4557 (Replaced by) 2018-06-04 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3509 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3509.pdf |