MA H3526 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 18 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-18 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 96 of the Acts of 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 18 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-18 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 96 of the Acts of 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to validating the Sherborn annual town election. Election Laws.
Title
Validating the Sherborn annual town election.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-08-18 | Joint | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 96 of the Acts of 2011 |
2011-08-15 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2011-08-11 | House | Enacted |
2011-08-08 | Senate | Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2011-08-08 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2011-08-08 | Senate | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2011-07-20 | Senate | Read and referred to the Senate Committee on Ethics and Rules |
2011-07-18 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2011-07-14 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2011-07-14 | House | Rules suspended |
2011-07-14 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2011-07-06 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2011-06-27 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2011-06-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Election Laws |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H3526 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=17061&generalCourtId=1 |