MA H3541 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4744
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on April 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4744
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4744
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
That the city of Boston be authorized to regulate rent for the use or occupancy of certain governmentally-involved housing in said city. Housing. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
To restore Boston's governmentally-involved housing protection
Sponsors
Rep. Byron Rushing [D] | Rep. Jeffrey Sanchez [D] | Rep. Evandro Carvalho [D] | Rep. Daniel Ryan [D] |
Rep. Adrian Madaro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-12 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4744 |
2018-01-12 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/23/2018 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2 |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-04-13 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Housing |
Same As/Similar To
H3727 (Similar To) 2017-08-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 65 of the Acts of 2017
H410 (Similar To) 2018-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H4571
S716 (Similar To) 2018-06-28 - Reported from the committee on Senate Rules and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H394 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H397 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H1701 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H3921 (Similar To) 2017-11-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4005
H4086 (Similar To) 2018-12-31 - Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting therefor a new draft, see H4927
H4744 (Replaced by) 2018-07-12 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H410 (Similar To) 2018-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H4571
S716 (Similar To) 2018-06-28 - Reported from the committee on Senate Rules and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H394 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H397 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H1701 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H3921 (Similar To) 2017-11-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4005
H4086 (Similar To) 2018-12-31 - Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting therefor a new draft, see H4927
H4744 (Replaced by) 2018-07-12 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3541 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3541.pdf |