MA H3550 | 2009-2010 | 186th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on November 10 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-11-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 130 of the Acts of 2009
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on November 10 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-11-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 130 of the Acts of 2009
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Designate a skating rink in North Adams as the Peter W. Foote Vietnam Veterans Memorial Skating Rink.
Title
Designating the Vietnam Veterans Memorial Skating Rink in the city of North Adams as the Peter W. Foote Vietnam Veterans Memorial Skating Rink.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-11-10 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 130 of the Acts of 2009 | |
2009-11-04 | Enacted | |
2009-11-04 | Enacted and laid before the Governor | |
2009-11-02 | Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed | |
2009-11-02 | Rules suspended | |
2009-11-02 | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session | |
2009-10-29 | Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Committee On Ethics and Rules | |
2009-10-26 | Read third and passed to be engrossed | |
2009-10-20 | Read second and ordered to a third reading | |
2009-10-20 | Rules suspended | |
2009-10-20 | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting | |
2009-10-13 | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Committee On Steering, Policy and Scheduling | |
2009-01-20 | Senate concurred | |
2009-01-20 | Referred to the committee on Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/186/House/H3550 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=4145&generalCourtId=2 |