MA H3550 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S249
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-3)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-19 - Accompanied S249
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-19 - Accompanied S249
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to financial literacy training in public high schools. Education.
Title
Relative to financial literacy in schools
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-19 | Senate | Accompanied S249 |
2017-06-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/13/2017 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
H240 (Similar To) 2018-01-19 - Accompanied S249
H2023 (Similar To) 2018-01-19 - Accompanied S249
S247 (Similar To) 2018-01-19 - Accompanied S249
S231 (Similar To) 2018-01-19 - Accompanied S249
H2227 (Similar To) 2018-06-14 - Accompanied a study order, see H4610
H40 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S249 (Replaced by) 2018-03-22 - New draft substituted, see S2343
S2343 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - Reprinted as amended, see S2374
H2023 (Similar To) 2018-01-19 - Accompanied S249
S247 (Similar To) 2018-01-19 - Accompanied S249
S231 (Similar To) 2018-01-19 - Accompanied S249
H2227 (Similar To) 2018-06-14 - Accompanied a study order, see H4610
H40 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S249 (Replaced by) 2018-03-22 - New draft substituted, see S2343
S2343 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - Reprinted as amended, see S2374
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3550 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3550.pdf |