MA H3553 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the emission of soot, smoke or other particulates by diesel-powered vehicles. Transportation.
Title
Prohibiting the practice of coal rolling
Sponsors
Rep. Brian Murray [D] | Rep. Timothy Whelan [R] | Rep. Brian Ashe [D] | Rep. Lindsay Sabadosa [D] |
Rep. Carmine Gentile [D] | Rep. David Robertson [D] | Rep. Michael Day [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-03 | House | No further action taken |
2022-05-17 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading |
2022-03-14 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2022-01-20 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/25/2022 from 03:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S9 (Similar To) 2021-03-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 8 of the Acts of 2021
H3434 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4966
H481 (Similar To) 2022-07-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4968
H3329 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5042
S577 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2800
S604 (Similar To) 2022-06-16 - Postponed to Monday, August 1, 2022
S2224 (Similar To) 2022-08-08 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2229 (Similar To) 2022-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see S2711
H5224 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3434 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4966
H481 (Similar To) 2022-07-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4968
H3329 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5042
S577 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2800
S604 (Similar To) 2022-06-16 - Postponed to Monday, August 1, 2022
S2224 (Similar To) 2022-08-08 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2229 (Similar To) 2022-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see S2711
H5224 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3553 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3553.pdf |