MA H3554 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4651
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4651
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4651
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to prohibit the application of herbicides within five hundred feet of a residence, school or playground. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
To amend 310 CMR 10.05 (3) (a) (2)
Sponsors
Rep. Chris Walsh [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-29 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4651 |
2015-09-23 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/29/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1 |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-05-21 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
2015-05-07 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
H4651 (Replaced by) 2016-09-29 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H2845 (Similar To) 2016-04-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1652 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H505 (Similar To) 2016-04-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4141
H506 (Similar To) 2016-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H4601
H2692 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H4744 (Similar To) 2017-01-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 429 of the Acts of 2016
H4745 (Similar To) 2017-01-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 430 of the Acts of 2016
H2845 (Similar To) 2016-04-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1652 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H505 (Similar To) 2016-04-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4141
H506 (Similar To) 2016-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H4601
H2692 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H4744 (Similar To) 2017-01-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 429 of the Acts of 2016
H4745 (Similar To) 2017-01-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 430 of the Acts of 2016
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3554 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3554.pdf |