MA H3556 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4503
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4503
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4503
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to exempt energy efficiency projects from certain sales tax and wage laws. Revenue.
Title
Relative to promote energy efficiency
Sponsors
Rep. Randy Hunt [R] | Rep. Matthew Beaton [R] | Sen. Donald Humason [R] | Rep. Bradley Jones [R] |
Rep. Shaunna O'Connell [R] | Rep. Daniel Winslow [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-11-19 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4503 |
2011-10-13 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/20/2011 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in A-2 |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2011-01-24 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
H4503 (Replaced by) 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H3556 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=12598&generalCourtId=1 |