MA H3557 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on July 11 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-07-30 - Amendment 1 rejected
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 11 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-07-30 - Amendment 1 rejected
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to reimbursement for ambulance services Section 23 contained in the engrossed Bill making appropriations for the fiscal year 2013 to provide for supplementing certain existing appropriations and for certain other activities and projects (see House, No. 3539), which had been returned by His Excellency the Governor with recommendation of amendment (for message, see House, No. 3554). July 11, 2013.
Title
Relative to reimbursement for ambulance services
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-30 | House | Amendment 1 rejected |
2013-07-30 | House | Governors amendment rejected |
2013-07-30 | House | Bills in the Third Reading special report accepted |
2013-07-15 | House | Referred to the committee on House Bills in the Third Reading |
2013-07-15 | House | For message, see H3554 |
2013-07-11 | House | Governor returned to the House with recommendation of amendment |
2013-07-11 | House | Enacted as section 23 of H3539 |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H3557 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H3557.pdf |