MA H3557 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5160
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to dental insurance benefit plans. Financial Services.
Title
Relative to transparency of dental benefits corporations
Sponsors
Rep. Kevin Honan [D] | Sen. Harriette Chandler [D] | Rep. David DeCoste [R] | Rep. Steven Howitt [R] |
Rep. David LeBoeuf [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-01 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5160 |
2019-10-22 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/29/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services |
Same As/Similar To
H2627 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
S960 (Similar To) 2020-02-06 - Accompanied H1413
H2768 (Similar To) 2020-11-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5103
S1677 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2549
H2827 (Similar To) 2019-07-15 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2289 (Similar To) 2020-12-16 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2295 (Similar To) 2019-07-31 - Accompanied H913
H4012 (Similar To) 2019-11-18 - Reported by H4210
H253 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
H4210 (Similar To) 2019-11-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 124 of the Acts of 2019
H5160 (Replaced by) 2020-12-01 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S960 (Similar To) 2020-02-06 - Accompanied H1413
H2768 (Similar To) 2020-11-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5103
S1677 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2549
H2827 (Similar To) 2019-07-15 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2289 (Similar To) 2020-12-16 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2295 (Similar To) 2019-07-31 - Accompanied H913
H4012 (Similar To) 2019-11-18 - Reported by H4210
H253 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
H4210 (Similar To) 2019-11-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 124 of the Acts of 2019
H5160 (Replaced by) 2020-12-01 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3557 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3557.pdf |