MA H3574 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 26 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 97 of the Acts of 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 26 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 97 of the Acts of 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a sick leave bank for Gina Rossi, an employee of the Parole Board. Senate Ways and Means .
Title
Establishing a sick leave bank for Gina Rossi, an employee of the Parole Board
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-08-26 | Senate | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 97 of the Acts of 2011 |
2011-08-22 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2011-08-22 | House | Enacted |
2011-08-22 | Senate | Emergency preamble adopted |
2011-08-18 | House | Emergency preamble adopted |
2011-08-15 | Senate | Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2011-08-15 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2011-08-15 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass |
2011-08-15 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee |
2011-08-08 | Senate | Read and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2011-08-04 | House | Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2011-07-28 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2011-07-28 | House | Rules suspended |
2011-07-28 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2011-07-28 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2011-07-08 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2011-06-29 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on the Judiciary |
2011-06-09 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H3574 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=16992&generalCourtId=1 |