MA H3579 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S422
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on March 30 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-30 - Accompanied S422
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 30 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-30 - Accompanied S422
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to child care for candidates for public office. Election Laws.
Title
Empowering parental participation in elected office
Sponsors
Rep. Kate Lipper-Garabedian [D] | Rep. Daniel Hunt [D] | Rep. Samantha Montano [D] | Rep. Thomas Stanley [D] |
Rep. Manny Cruz [D] | Rep. Adrian Madaro [D] | Rep. Simon Cataldo [D] | Rep. David Vieira [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-30 | Senate | Accompanied S422 |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-02-12 | House | Reporting date extended to Tuesday May 28, 2024, pending concurrence |
2023-05-11 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/17/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-03-30 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Election Laws |
Same As/Similar To
H666 (Similar To) 2024-07-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4733
S422 (Replaced by) 2024-05-30 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S422 (Replaced by) 2024-05-30 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3579 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3579.pdf |