MA H3599 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4279
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 30 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4279
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 30 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4279
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to implement a 4 day work week. Labor and Workforce Development.
Title
To implement a 4 day work week in the Commonwealth
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-25 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4279 |
2023-10-30 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 11/14/2023 from 10:30 AM-01:30 PM in B-2 |
2023-10-30 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/14/2023 from 10:30 AM-01:30 PM in B-2 |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-03-30 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Labor and Workforce Development |
Same As/Similar To
H3849 (Similar To) 2024-01-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4279
H4279 (Replaced by) 2024-01-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4547 (Similar To) 2024-04-11 - Adopted
H4548 (Similar To) 2024-04-11 - Adopted
H4549 (Similar To) 2024-04-11 - Adopted
H4279 (Replaced by) 2024-01-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4547 (Similar To) 2024-04-11 - Adopted
H4548 (Similar To) 2024-04-11 - Adopted
H4549 (Similar To) 2024-04-11 - Adopted
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3599 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3599.pdf |