MA H3607 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5081
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to protective order hearings. The Judiciary.
Title
Ensuring the efficiency of protective order hearings
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-12 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5081 |
2019-09-17 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/24/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S1828 (Similar To) 2020-05-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2820 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4405
S1873 (Similar To) 2020-06-29 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H724 (Similar To) 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5116
S1986 (Similar To) 2020-01-30 - New draft substituted, see S2478
H1363 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H5081 (Replaced by) 2020-11-12 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H2820 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4405
S1873 (Similar To) 2020-06-29 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H724 (Similar To) 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5116
S1986 (Similar To) 2020-01-30 - New draft substituted, see S2478
H1363 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H5081 (Replaced by) 2020-11-12 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3607 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3607.pdf |