MA H3608 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4519
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-11-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4519
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-11-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4519
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to designating kickball as the official gym game of the commonwealth. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Designating kickball as the official gym game of the commonwealth
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-11-29 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4519 |
2012-02-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/31/2012 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2011-01-24 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
H4519 (Replaced by) 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H3608 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=12918&generalCourtId=1 |