MA H3608 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4854
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 30 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4854
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 30 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4854
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to optometrist licensure. Public Health.
Title
Relative to updating the licensure of optometrists
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-18 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4854 |
2024-03-25 | House | Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2023-09-18 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 09/21/2023 from 09:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-09-11 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/21/2023 from 09:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-03-30 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
H4571 (Similar To) 2024-07-08 - Adopted, in concurrence
H4743 (Similar To) 2024-06-13 - Published as amended, see H4758
H4758 (Similar To) 2024-07-31 - Committee of conference appointed (Crighton-Velis-Fattman), in concurrence
H4798 (Similar To) 2024-07-08 - Adopted, in concurrence
H4854 (Replaced by) 2024-07-18 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H4961 (Similar To) 2024-08-05 - Adopted
H4743 (Similar To) 2024-06-13 - Published as amended, see H4758
H4758 (Similar To) 2024-07-31 - Committee of conference appointed (Crighton-Velis-Fattman), in concurrence
H4798 (Similar To) 2024-07-08 - Adopted, in concurrence
H4854 (Replaced by) 2024-07-18 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H4961 (Similar To) 2024-08-05 - Adopted
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3608 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3608.pdf |