MA H3632 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 30 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-09 - Hearing scheduled for 06/21/2023 from 09:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
Pending: Joint Public Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 30 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-09 - Hearing scheduled for 06/21/2023 from 09:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
Pending: Joint Public Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to establishing an advisory committee (including members of the General Court) on the accessibility of fresh food retail in communities. Public Health.
Title
Establishing an advisory committee on the accessibility of fresh food retail in communities throughout the Commonwealth
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-09 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/21/2023 from 09:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-03-30 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
S505 (Similar To) 2024-02-15 - Accompanied a study order, see S2649
S287 (Similar To) 2024-03-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2661
S1344 (Similar To) 2024-02-15 - Accompanied a study order, see S2648
S407 (Similar To) 2024-02-15 - Accompanied a study order, see S2655
S680 (Similar To) 2024-05-09 - Accompanied H1139
S287 (Similar To) 2024-03-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2661
S1344 (Similar To) 2024-02-15 - Accompanied a study order, see S2648
S407 (Similar To) 2024-02-15 - Accompanied a study order, see S2655
S680 (Similar To) 2024-05-09 - Accompanied H1139
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3632 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3632.pdf |