MA H3654 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Enrolled on December 15 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-15 - Enacted and laid before the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on December 15 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-15 - Enacted and laid before the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
(by vote of the town) that certain future employees of the town of Arlington be exempt from the provisions of civil service law
Title
Exempting original labor service appointments in the town of Arlington from the civil service law
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-15 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2011-12-15 | House | Enacted |
2011-12-12 | Senate | Read, rules suspended, read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2011-12-05 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2011-11-09 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2011-11-07 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading |
2011-10-27 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2011-09-26 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/27/2011 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-1 |
2011-08-03 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2011-08-01 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H3654 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=17107&generalCourtId=1 |