MA H3654 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2096
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 46 of the Acts of 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 46 of the Acts of 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
That the city of Lowell be authorized to use a certain parcel of land in the city of Lowell and the town of Tewksbury for the construction of a public high school and other school related purposes. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing the City of Lowell to use certain municipal land for school purposes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-07-07 - House - House On Enactment Land Taking Yea and Nay No. 75 (Y: 148 N: 1 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-07 - Senate - Senate Enacted Roll Call #59 [36 YEAS - 0 NAYS] (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-07-07 - Senate - Senate Enacted Roll Call #59 [36 YEAS - 0 NAYS] (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-14 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 46 of the Acts of 2017 | |
2017-07-07 | Senate | Laid before the Governor |
2017-07-07 | Senate | Enacted -see Roll Call #59 [36 YEAS - 0 NAYS] |
2017-07-07 | House | Enacted - 148 YEAS to 1 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 75) |
2017-07-03 | House | House concurred in the Senate amendment |
2017-06-23 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Bills in the Third Reading |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2017-06-22 | Senate | New text (Donoghue) substituted, see S2096 |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Read second |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2017-06-05 | Senate | Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2017-05-15 | House | Read third (title changed), amended and passed to be engrossed |
2017-05-11 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2017-05-08 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading |
2017-05-04 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-04-24 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
2017-04-13 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
S2096 (Replaced by) 2017-06-22 - See H3654
H306 (Similar To) 2018-02-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2306
H1878 (Similar To) 2018-05-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4502
H1082 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H311 (Similar To) 2018-07-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H240 (Similar To) 2018-01-19 - Accompanied S249
H3733 (Similar To) 2018-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4396
H1319 (Similar To) 2018-07-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4767
H1132 (Similar To) 2018-06-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4625
S2100 (Similar To) 2017-06-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2257 (Similar To) 2018-01-25 - Referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2367 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H306 (Similar To) 2018-02-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2306
H1878 (Similar To) 2018-05-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4502
H1082 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H311 (Similar To) 2018-07-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H240 (Similar To) 2018-01-19 - Accompanied S249
H3733 (Similar To) 2018-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4396
H1319 (Similar To) 2018-07-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4767
H1132 (Similar To) 2018-06-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4625
S2100 (Similar To) 2017-06-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2257 (Similar To) 2018-01-25 - Referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2367 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means