MA H3656 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on June 25 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 25 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the awarding of sheet metal work contracts. Labor and Workforce Development.
Title
Relative to sheet metal work
Sponsors
Rep. Angelo Puppolo [D] | Rep. Brian Ashe [D] | Rep. Carlos Gonzalez [D] | Rep. Kay Khan [D] |
Sen. Paul Mark [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-11 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2015-12-23 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/06/2016 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1 |
2015-08-31 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-08-27 | House | Discharged to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
2015-07-13 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-07-08 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Labor and Workforce Development |
2015-06-25 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
H2391 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4367
H1553 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H2171 (Similar To) 2016-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4611
H2172 (Similar To) 2016-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4611
H2392 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4367
H1553 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H2171 (Similar To) 2016-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4611
H2172 (Similar To) 2016-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4611
H2392 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4367
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3656 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3656.pdf |