MA H3660 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 30 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-21 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 30 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-21 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a local option empty homes tax on vacant units in residential buildings. Revenue.
Title
Enabling a local option empty homes tax on vacant units in residential buildings
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-21 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-02-12 | House | Reporting date extended to Tuesday April 30, 2024, pending concurrence |
2023-09-19 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/26/2023 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-03-30 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3660 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3660.pdf |