MA H3679 | 2009-2010 | 186th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-23 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-23 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
That the Division of Health Care Finance and Policy report appropriate legislation to repeal certain mandated health benefits
Title
That the Division of Health Care Finance and Policy report appropriate legislation to repeal certain mandated health benefits
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-23 | Read second and ordered to a third reading | |
2010-06-21 | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading | |
2010-05-20 | Committee recommended bill ought to pass and referred to the House Committee On Steering, Policy and Scheduling | |
2010-03-22 | Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing | |
2009-01-20 | Public Hearing date 6/24 at 1:30 PM in Hearing Room B2 | |
2009-01-20 | Senate concurred | |
2009-01-20 | Referred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.mass.gov/legis/186history/h03679.htm |
Text | http://www.mass.gov/legis/bills/house/186/ht03/ht03679.htm |