MA H3687 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 14 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-10-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 135 of the Acts of 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 14 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-10-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 135 of the Acts of 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Substituted by the House, on motion of Mr. Madden of Nantucket, for a bill with the same title (House, No. 3454). August 22, 2011.
Title
Authorizing the town of West Tisbury to place a certain question on the ballot relative to the issuance of licenses for the sale of wines and malt beverages in restaurants, inns and hotels and the issuance of 1 day licenses for the sale of wines and malt beverages at events
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-10-14 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 135 of the Acts of 2011 | |
2011-10-06 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2011-10-06 | House | Enacted |
2011-10-05 | House | House concurred in the Senate amendment |
2011-10-05 | House | Rules suspended |
2011-09-29 | Senate | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2011-09-29 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2011-09-22 | Senate | Read second, amended and ordered to a third reading |
2011-08-25 | Senate | Read and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2011-08-22 | House | Passed to be engrossed |
2011-08-22 | House | Substituted for H3454 |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H3687 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=17300&generalCourtId=1 |