MA H3687 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on November 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-11-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 131 of the Acts of 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on November 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-11-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 131 of the Acts of 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Bill Title: An Act authorizing the city of Revere to issue bonds or notes for the payment of a certain litigation settlement By Representative Reinstein of Revere and Senator Petruccelli, a joint petition of Kathi-Anne Reinstein and Anthony W. Petruccelli (with the approval of the mayor and city council) that the city of Revere be authorized to issue bonds or notes for the payment of a litigation settlement. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing the city of Revere to issue bonds or notes for the payment of a certain litigation settlement
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-11-14 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 131 of the Acts of 2013 | |
2013-11-12 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2013-11-12 | House | Enacted |
2013-11-07 | Senate | Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2013-11-07 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2013-10-30 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2013-10-21 | Senate | Read and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2013-10-17 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2013-10-16 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2013-10-15 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading |
2013-10-15 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2013-10-09 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-10-07 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H3687 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H3687.pdf |