MA H37 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on February 3 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A message from His Excellency the Governor submitting recommendations for making appropriations for the fiscal year 2011 to provide for supplementing certain existing appropriations and for certain other activities and projects
Title
Making appropriations for the fiscal year 2011 to provide for supplementing certain existing appropriations and for certain other activities and projects
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2011-03-29 | House | Reported, on a part of the residue, by H3318 |
2011-03-24 | House | Reported, in part, by H3314 |
2011-02-03 | House | Referred to House Committee on Ways and Means |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H37 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=14928&generalCourtId=1 |