MA H3704 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on September 24 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-09-28 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 24 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-09-28 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a sick leave bank for Maribel Sepulveda, an employee of the Executive Office of Health and Human Services. Public Service.
Title
Establishing a sick leave bank for Maribel Sepulveda, an employee of the Executive Office of Health and Human Services
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-09-28 | Senate | Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2015-09-24 | House | Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2015-08-20 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2015-08-20 | House | Rules suspended |
2015-08-20 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2015-08-13 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2015-08-03 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-07-30 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
2015-06-15 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
H1292 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H1293 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H1294 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H1943 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4242
H2874 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a study order, see H4177
H1293 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H1294 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H1943 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4242
H2874 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a study order, see H4177
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3704 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3704.pdf |