MA H3704 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5042
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-5)
Status: Introduced on May 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5042
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5042
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to establishing a minimum age requirement for entry into cannabis-related events, conferences, forums and exhibitions. Cannabis Policy.
Title
Relative to establishing a minimum age of entry for cannabis-related events, conferences, forums and exhibitions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-26 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5042 |
2019-11-01 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/05/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-05-06 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Cannabis Policy |
Same As/Similar To
S1133 (Similar To) 2019-06-10 - Accompanied H3535
S1708 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2549
H3536 (Similar To) 2020-01-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4327
H3538 (Similar To) 2020-03-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4522
H3537 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5042
S1130 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2531
H398 (Similar To) 2020-01-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4291
H4121 (Similar To) 2019-10-16 - Referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H5042 (Replaced by) 2020-10-26 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S1708 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2549
H3536 (Similar To) 2020-01-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4327
H3538 (Similar To) 2020-03-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4522
H3537 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5042
S1130 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2531
H398 (Similar To) 2020-01-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4291
H4121 (Similar To) 2019-10-16 - Referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H5042 (Replaced by) 2020-10-26 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3704 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3704.pdf |