MA H372 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4880
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4880
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4880
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to restrict sales of certain items and products at flea markets, so-called. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.
Title
Restricting the sale of certain items at flea markets
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-30 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4880 |
2021-07-27 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 08/02/2021 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
S1335 (Similar To) 2021-12-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H2859 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
H3906 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5245
S1915 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
S790 (Similar To) 2021-11-17 - Accompanied S771
H3729 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1857 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
S1854 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5245
S200 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2666
S1322 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - New draft substituted, see S2994
S1459 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2692
H4880 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H2859 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
H3906 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5245
S1915 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
S790 (Similar To) 2021-11-17 - Accompanied S771
H3729 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1857 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
S1854 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5245
S200 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2666
S1322 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - New draft substituted, see S2994
S1459 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2692
H4880 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H372 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H372.pdf |