MA H3732 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on May 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-14 - Accompanied H2915
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-14 - Accompanied H2915
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to authorizing the establishment of a means tested senior citizen property tax exemption. Revenue.
Title
Authorizing the establishment of a mean tested senior citizen property tax exemption
Sponsors
Rep. Kate Lipper-Garabedian [D] | Sen. Jason Lewis [D] | Rep. Brian Murray [D] | Rep. Josh Cutler [D] |
Rep. Carol Doherty [D] | Rep. Adam Scanlon [D] | Rep. Tram Nguyen [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-14 | House | Accompanied H2915 |
2022-04-01 | House | House concurred |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Amendment (changing reporting date to Wednesday April 6, 2022) adopted, pending concurrence |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Wednesday April 6, 2022, pending concurrence |
2022-02-09 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday March 30, 2022, pending concurrence |
2021-12-14 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/28/2021 from 10:00 AM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-05-06 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
H2905 (Similar To) 2022-04-14 - Accompanied H2915
H2915 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H2915 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3732 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3732.pdf |