MA H3754 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H325
Note: Legislation replaced by H4635
Note: Legislation replaced by H4635
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on September 10 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4635
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 10 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4635
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to healthy youth
Title
Relative to healthy youth
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-26 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4635 |
2015-09-10 | House | Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2015-09-10 | House | New draft of H325, H339, H366, H410, H439, H448, H466 and H483 |
2015-09-10 | House | Reported from the committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
H325 (Replaces) 2015-09-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3754
H4635 (Replaced by) 2016-09-26 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H3683 (Similar To) 2015-07-23 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1975 (Similar To) 2015-07-23 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1976 (Similar To) 2015-11-18 - New draft substituted, as amended, see S2047
S2013 (Similar To) 2015-11-05 - Reported (in part) by S2048
S2254 (Similar To) 2016-04-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4635 (Replaced by) 2016-09-26 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H3683 (Similar To) 2015-07-23 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1975 (Similar To) 2015-07-23 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1976 (Similar To) 2015-11-18 - New draft substituted, as amended, see S2047
S2013 (Similar To) 2015-11-05 - Reported (in part) by S2048
S2254 (Similar To) 2016-04-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3754 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3754.pdf |