MA H3760 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H3719
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 104 of the Acts of 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 104 of the Acts of 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to Strengthening Campaign Finance Reporting Requirements
Title
Relative to Strengthening Campaign Finance Reporting Requirements
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-15 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 104 of the Acts of 2014 | |
2014-05-12 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2014-05-12 | House | Enacted |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Emergency preamble adopted |
2014-05-08 | House | Emergency preamble adopted |
2014-05-05 | House | House concurred in the Senate amendment |
2014-03-17 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Bills in the Third Reading |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Read second, amended (as recommended by the committee on Ways and Means), ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment |
2013-11-14 | Senate | Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2013-11-13 | House | Passed to be engrossed 149 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 254) |
2013-11-13 | House | Substituted for H3719 |
Same As/Similar To
H3719 (Replaces) 2013-11-13 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, see H3760
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H3760 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H3760.pdf |