MA H3770 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on November 3 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-11-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 153 of the Acts of 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on November 3 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-11-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 153 of the Acts of 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Interim report of the Special Committee on Redistricting, pursuant to the Senate Order establishing a Special Commission on Redistricting (Senate, No. 9), reports the accompanying committee bill (House, No. 3770)
Title
RELATIVE TO ESTABLISHING REPRESENTATIVE DISTRICTS IN THE GENERAL COURT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-11-03 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 153 of the Acts of 2011 | |
2011-11-01 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2011-11-01 | House | Enacted |
2011-11-01 | Senate | Emergency preamble adopted |
2011-11-01 | House | Emergency preamble adopted |
2011-11-01 | Senate | Read, rules suspended, read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2011-11-01 | House | Passed to be engrossed - 151 YEAS to 3 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 128) |
2011-11-01 | House | Quorum Roll Call - 155 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 127) |
2011-11-01 | House | Amendment 7 rejected |
2011-11-01 | House | Amendment 6 rejected |
2011-11-01 | House | Amendment 5 rejected |
2011-11-01 | House | Amendment 2 adopted |
2011-11-01 | House | Amendment 1 rejected |
2011-11-01 | House | Amendment 4 rejected |
2011-11-01 | House | Amendment 3 rejected |
2011-11-01 | House | Amendment 8 rejected |
2011-11-01 | House | Read third |
2011-10-31 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2011-10-31 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2011-10-27 | House | Bill (Appendix A) reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2011-10-26 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |