MA H3770 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H3701
Note: Legislation replaced by H3814
Note: Legislation replaced by H3814
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Vetoed on May 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-01 - Section 5 passed over veto -see Roll Call #52 (Yeas 37 to Nays 3)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-01 - Section 5 passed over veto -see Roll Call #52 (Yeas 37 to Nays 3)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
The committee of conference on the disagreeing votes of the two branches with reference to the Senate amendment (striking out all after the enacting clause and inserting in place thereof the text contained in Senate document numbered 2442) of the House Bill financing the reconstruction of the Soldiers’ Home in Holyoke (House, No. 3701), reports recommending passage of the accompanying bill (House, No. 3770).
Title
Financing the reconstruction of the Soldiers’ Home in Holyoke
Sponsors
House House Committee on Ways and Means | House Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Roll Calls
2021-07-01 - Senate - Senate Question on passing Section 5, notwithstanding the objections of the Governor Roll Call #52 (Y: 37 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Senate Enacted Roll Call #30 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - House - House Enacted - 160 YEAS to 0 NAYS (Y: 160 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Senate Enacted Roll Call #30 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - House - House Enacted - 160 YEAS to 0 NAYS (Y: 160 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-01 | Senate | Section 5 passed over veto -see Roll Call #52 (Yeas 37 to Nays 3) |
2021-06-30 | House | Section 5 passed over veto - 130 YEAS to 30 NAYS (See YEA and NAY No. 52 ) |
2021-06-30 | House | Rules suspended |
2021-06-30 | House | Committee reported that the matter be scheduled for consideration and Rule 7A suspended |
2021-06-30 | House | The following section reported from the committee on House Ways and Means recommending that the action of the General Court stand; and the section was referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2021-05-27 | House | Referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2021-05-27 | House | For message, see H3814 |
2021-05-25 | Governor returned to the House with veto | |
2021-05-25 | Signed (in part), Chapter 15 of the Acts of 2021 | |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Laid before the Governor |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Enacted -see Roll Call #30 (Yeas 40 - Nays 0) |
2021-05-18 | House | Enacted - 160 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY No. 36 ) |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Emergency preamble adopted |
2021-05-17 | House | Emergency preamble adopted |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Committee of conference report accepted. in concurrence |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2021-05-17 | House | Committee of conference report accepted |
2021-05-17 | House | Rules suspended |
2021-05-17 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting, the question being on acceptance |
2021-05-17 | House | Referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2021-05-17 | House | Reported on H3701 |
2021-05-17 | House | Reported from the committee of conference |
Same As/Similar To
H3701 (Replaced by) 2021-05-17 - Reported by H3770
H3814 (Replaced by) 2021-05-27 - Placed on file
H102 (Similar To) 2021-04-14 - Rejected
H96 (Similar To) 2021-04-14 - New draft substituted, see H3701
H64 (Similar To) 2021-03-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see H96
H99 (Similar To) 2021-04-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 11 of the Acts of 2021
H3934 (Similar To) 2022-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5284
S1690 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
H3814 (Replaced by) 2021-05-27 - Placed on file
H102 (Similar To) 2021-04-14 - Rejected
H96 (Similar To) 2021-04-14 - New draft substituted, see H3701
H64 (Similar To) 2021-03-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see H96
H99 (Similar To) 2021-04-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 11 of the Acts of 2021
H3934 (Similar To) 2022-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5284
S1690 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679