MA H3771 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H3702
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-18 - Text of amendment, see H3702
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-18 - Text of amendment, see H3702
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Similar Bills
Title
Similar Bills
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-18 | House | Text of amendment, see H3702 |
2021-05-18 | House | Recommended new text for H3702 |
Same As/Similar To
H3702 (Replaced by) 2021-05-28 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 16 of the Acts of 2021
S2472 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3865 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4541
H3872 (Similar To) 2021-06-15 - Published as amended, see H3874
H3874 (Similar To) 2021-06-15 - See S2472
S2516 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
H4121 (Similar To) 2021-09-23 - Adopted - 131 YEAS to 28 NAYS (See YEA and NAY No. 103 )
S2401 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2680
S1897 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
S1450 (Similar To) 2022-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2887
H139 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5040
S1194 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2691
H494 (Similar To) 2022-07-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4968
S250 (Similar To) 2022-09-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4938
S2289 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4459
S1193 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2691
H4470 (Similar To) 2022-05-19 - Reported by H4805
S2982 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Reprinted, as amended, see S2985
H5055 (Similar To) 2022-08-08 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3456 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4459
H2953 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H5200
S2472 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3865 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4541
H3872 (Similar To) 2021-06-15 - Published as amended, see H3874
H3874 (Similar To) 2021-06-15 - See S2472
S2516 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
H4121 (Similar To) 2021-09-23 - Adopted - 131 YEAS to 28 NAYS (See YEA and NAY No. 103 )
S2401 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2680
S1897 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
S1450 (Similar To) 2022-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2887
H139 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5040
S1194 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2691
H494 (Similar To) 2022-07-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4968
S250 (Similar To) 2022-09-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4938
S2289 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4459
S1193 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2691
H4470 (Similar To) 2022-05-19 - Reported by H4805
S2982 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Reprinted, as amended, see S2985
H5055 (Similar To) 2022-08-08 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3456 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4459
H2953 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H5200
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3771 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3771.pdf |