MA H3782 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5143
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5143
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5143
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to mental health sick days for public school students. Education.
Title
Providing mental health sick days to public school students
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-01 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5143 |
2021-12-27 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/04/2022 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-05-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
S327 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
H629 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H589 (Similar To) 2022-08-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5136
H5143 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H629 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H589 (Similar To) 2022-08-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5136
H5143 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3782 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3782.pdf |