MA H3783 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 136 of the Acts of 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 136 of the Acts of 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
That the town of Montague be authorized to issue an additional license for the sale of all alcoholic beverages to be drunk on premises . Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing the town of Montague to grant an additional license for the sale of all alcoholic beverages to be drunk on the premises
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-08 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 136 of the Acts of 2016 | |
2016-06-29 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2016-06-29 | House | Enacted |
2016-06-27 | House | House concurred in the Senate amendment |
2016-04-26 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Bills in the Third Reading |
2016-04-25 | Senate | Read third, amended and passed to be engrossed |
2016-04-25 | Senate | Taken out the Orders of the Day |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2015-11-09 | Senate | Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2015-11-05 | House | Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2015-10-29 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2015-10-29 | House | Rules suspended |
2015-10-29 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2015-10-19 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2015-10-07 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 10/13/2015 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1 |
2015-10-06 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/13/2015 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in 222 |
2015-10-01 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-09-30 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3783 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3783.pdf |