MA H3786 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on June 29 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-07-26 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 29 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-07-26 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the Department of Inspectional Services in the city of Lynn. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Amending the act establishing a Department of Inspectional Services in the city of Lynn
Sponsors
Rep. Daniel Cahill [D] | Sen. Thomas McGee [D] | Sen. Brendan Crighton [D] | Rep. Lori Ehrlich [D] |
Rep. Donald Wong [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-26 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2019-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2017-07-26 | House | Rules suspended |
2017-07-26 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2017-07-26 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2017-07-18 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/25/2017 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2017-07-05 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-06-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
H2780 (Similar To) 2017-10-05 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 88 of the Acts of 2017
S2222 (Similar To) 2017-12-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 165 of the Acts of 2017
H4265 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 189 of the Acts of 2018
H4268 (Similar To) 2018-08-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 169 of the Acts of 2018
H4302 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H4325
H4325 (Similar To) 2018-03-27 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 58 of the Acts of 2018
S2222 (Similar To) 2017-12-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 165 of the Acts of 2017
H4265 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 189 of the Acts of 2018
H4268 (Similar To) 2018-08-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 169 of the Acts of 2018
H4302 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H4325
H4325 (Similar To) 2018-03-27 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 58 of the Acts of 2018
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3786 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3786.pdf |