MA H4268 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 169 of the Acts of 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 169 of the Acts of 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Mr. Crighton of Lynn, a petition (subject to Joint Rule 12) of Brendan P. Crighton and Daniel Cahill that the Department of Conservation and Recreation be authorized to grant a certain easement for economic development in the city of Lynn. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Amending the authorization for the exchange of an easement in the control of the Department of Conservation and Recreation to facilitate a project important to the economic development of the city of Lynn
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-07-25 - House - House On Enactment Land taking Yea and Nay No. 413 (Y: 152 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-25 - Senate - Senate Enacted - roll call #472 [37 YEAS - 0 NAYS] (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-07-25 - Senate - Senate Enacted - roll call #472 [37 YEAS - 0 NAYS] (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-03 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 169 of the Acts of 2018 | |
2018-07-25 | Senate | Laid before the Governor |
2018-07-25 | Senate | Enacted - roll call #472 [37 YEAS - 0 NAYS] |
2018-07-25 | House | Enacted - 152 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 413) |
2018-07-23 | Senate | Emergency preamble adopted |
2018-07-23 | House | Emergency preamble adopted |
2018-07-19 | Senate | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2018-07-19 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2018-07-11 | Senate | Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading |
2018-07-09 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2018-06-25 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2018-06-25 | House | Rules suspended |
2018-06-25 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2018-06-25 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2018-04-09 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2018-03-26 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday May 9, 2018, pending concurrence |
2018-03-12 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 03/14/2018 from 02:00 PM-03:00 PM in B-2 |
2018-03-12 | Joint | Hearing canceled – new hearing TBD |
2018-03-06 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 03/13/2018 from 02:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1 |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2018-02-26 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
2018-02-22 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
H4265 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 189 of the Acts of 2018
H3786 (Similar To) 2017-07-26 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S1676 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - New draft substituted, see S2576
S2222 (Similar To) 2017-12-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 165 of the Acts of 2017
S2369 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 212 of the Acts of 2018
H4325 (Similar To) 2018-03-27 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 58 of the Acts of 2018
H3786 (Similar To) 2017-07-26 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S1676 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - New draft substituted, see S2576
S2222 (Similar To) 2017-12-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 165 of the Acts of 2017
S2369 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 212 of the Acts of 2018
H4325 (Similar To) 2018-03-27 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 58 of the Acts of 2018