MA H3790 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H3769
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 57 of the Acts of 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 57 of the Acts of 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the town of Hadley to grant 6 additional licenses for the sale of all alcoholic beverages and 6 additional licenses for the sale of wines and malt beverages to be drunk on the premises
Title
Authorizing the town of Hadley to grant 6 additional licenses for the sale of all alcoholic beverages and 6 additional licenses for the sale of wines and malt beverages to be drunk on the premises
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-26 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 57 of the Acts of 2014 | |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2014-03-20 | House | Enacted |
2014-03-17 | House | House concurred in the Senate amendment |
2014-03-17 | House | Bills in the Third Reading special report adopted |
2014-03-12 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Bills in the Third Reading |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Read third, amended and passed to be engrossed |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2014-01-13 | Senate | Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2014-01-09 | House | Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2013-12-30 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2013-12-30 | House | Rules suspended |
2013-12-30 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2013-11-25 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2013-11-25 | House | New draft of H3769 |
2013-11-25 | House | Reported from the committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
H3769 (Replaces) 2013-11-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3790
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H3790 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H3790.pdf |