MA H3797 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H3671
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on November 16 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-11-16 - Laid before the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on November 16 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-11-16 - Laid before the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AUTHORIZING THE RELEASE OF CERTAIN LAND IN THE TOWN OF DARTMOUTH FROM THE OPERATION OF AN AGRICULTURAL PRESERVATION RESTRICTION
Title
AUTHORIZING THE RELEASE OF CERTAIN LAND IN THE TOWN OF DARTMOUTH FROM THE OPERATION OF AN AGRICULTURAL PRESERVATION RESTRICTION
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-11-16 | Senate | Laid before the Governor |
2011-11-16 | Senate | Enacted - Roll Call #135 [36 yeas - 0 nays] |
2011-11-16 | House | Enacted - 155 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 175) |
2011-11-16 | Senate | Emergency preamble adopted |
2011-11-16 | House | Emergency preamble adopted |
2011-11-16 | Senate | Read, rules suspended, read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2011-11-16 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2011-11-16 | House | Rules suspended |
2011-11-15 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2011-11-15 | House | Rules suspended |
2011-11-14 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading |
2011-11-14 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the House committee on Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2011-11-09 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the House committee on Ways and Means |
2011-11-09 | House | New draft of H3671 |
2011-11-09 | House | Reported from the committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
H3671 (Replaces) 2011-11-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3797
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H3797 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=17592&generalCourtId=1 |