MA H3798 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5220
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H5220
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H5220
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to security guard licensing. Public Safety and Homeland Security.
Title
Relative to security guard licensing
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-08 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5220 |
2021-06-30 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/14/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-05-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |
Same As/Similar To
H3774 (Similar To) 2021-08-05 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 39 of the Acts of 2021
S1203 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2499 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H5190
H472 (Similar To) 2022-06-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4880
S240 (Similar To) 2021-11-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4242
S1614 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2762
S1374 (Similar To) 2022-02-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4464
S173 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Accompanied H313
S210 (Similar To) 2022-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2887
H5220 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H647 (Similar To) 2022-05-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4795
S1203 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2499 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H5190
H472 (Similar To) 2022-06-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4880
S240 (Similar To) 2021-11-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4242
S1614 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2762
S1374 (Similar To) 2022-02-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4464
S173 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Accompanied H313
S210 (Similar To) 2022-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2887
H5220 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H647 (Similar To) 2022-05-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4795
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3798 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3798.pdf |