MA H3803 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S42
Note: Replaces legislation H997
Note: Replaces legislation H997
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on November 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Mr. Sannicandro of Ashland, for the committee on Higher Education, on Senate, No. 42 and House, No. 977, a Bill to improve the educational rewards grant program to assist low income workers (House, No. 3803). November 10, 2011.
Title
TO IMPROVE THE EDUCATIONAL REWARDS GRANT PROGRAM TO ASSIST LOW INCOME WORKERS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2011-11-10 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the House committee on Ways and Means |
2011-11-10 | House | New draft of S42 and H977 |
2011-11-10 | House | Reported from the committee on Higher Education |
Same As/Similar To
S42 (Replaces) 2011-11-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3803
H997 (Replaces) 2012-08-30 - Accompanied a study order, H4418
H997 (Replaces) 2012-08-30 - Accompanied a study order, H4418
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H3803 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=17512&generalCourtId=1 |