MA H3803 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4403
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 20 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 20 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to contributions from political action committees to candidates for state representative. Election Laws.
Title
Relative to campaign fundraising for state representatives
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-10 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4403 |
2019-10-08 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/16/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-05-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Election Laws |
Same As/Similar To
H4403 (Replaced by) 2020-02-10 - Reported, in part, by H639
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3803 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3803.pdf |