MA H3804 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4619
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on October 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4619
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4619
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to improving and expanding educational opportunity.
Title
To improving and expanding educational opportunity.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-22 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4619 |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2016-03-16 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday June 3, 2016, pending concurrence |
2015-10-13 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/13/2015 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2015-10-13 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-10-13 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
H4619 (Replaced by) 2016-09-22 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S1 (Similar To) 2015-01-08 - Placed on file
H49 (Similar To) 2015-02-11 - Reported, in part, by H52
H55 (Similar To) 2015-04-17 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 13 of the Acts of 2015
H59 (Similar To) 2016-01-06 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 165 of the Acts of 2015
H60 (Similar To) 2015-03-26 - Reported, in part, by H3203
H4756 (Similar To) 2017-01-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 393 of the Acts of 2016
H4755 (Similar To) 2016-12-12 - See H2319
S1 (Similar To) 2015-01-08 - Placed on file
H49 (Similar To) 2015-02-11 - Reported, in part, by H52
H55 (Similar To) 2015-04-17 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 13 of the Acts of 2015
H59 (Similar To) 2016-01-06 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 165 of the Acts of 2015
H60 (Similar To) 2015-03-26 - Reported, in part, by H3203
H4756 (Similar To) 2017-01-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 393 of the Acts of 2016
H4755 (Similar To) 2016-12-12 - See H2319
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3804 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3804.pdf |